+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Environment and Natural Resources
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/26/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendment
112054 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/15/2021)
Delete lines 29 - 42 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2021: Floor vote: S 334 Filed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 23, 2021: Floor vote: S 334 Filed
- Yeas: 5