+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/29/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
400120 - Amendment
Between lines 76 and 77 insert:
565236 - Amendment
Between lines 76 and 77 insert:
146388 - Amendment to Amendment (539088)
Delete line 58 and insert:
652158 - Amendment to Amendment (539088)
Delete lines 70 - 72 and insert:
539088 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 163.31801 - Impact fees; short title; intent; definitions; ordinances levying impact fees.
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 324 Filed
- Yeas: 6
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 324 c1
- Yeas: 6
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 324 c1
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor