+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
On December 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/09/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On October 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
+ − Amendments (4)
760772 - Amendment
Delete lines 83 - 84 and insert:
430612 - Amendment to Amendment (484256)
04/01/2013 at 8:16 AM
693492 - Amendment to Amendment (484256)
03/20/2013 at 1:51 PM
484256 - Amendment (Delete All)
03/19/2013 at 2:17 PM
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Commerce and Tourism
Type:
Primary Sponsor