+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 185 (Ch. 2018-129)
- Substituted HB 185
- Read 2nd time
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/17/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 322 Filed
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 322 Filed
- Yeas: 10
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 322 Filed
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor