+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2019-49
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Calendar
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
- Received
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (150002)
- Read 2nd time
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Education read 1st time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Education
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/19, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Rules
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
150002 - Substitute Amendment (434076)
Between lines 166 and 167 insert:
434076 - Amendment
Delete line 166 and insert:
374254 - Amendment
Delete lines 140 - 141 and insert:
637096 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
193838 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 318 Filed
- Yeas: 6
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 318 c1
- Yeas: 8
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 318 c2
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2019: Floor vote: S 318 e1
- Yeas: 112
April 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 318 e1
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor