+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 115 (Ch. 2014-27)
- Substituted CS/HB 115
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/08/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On October 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
793024 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0318 Filed
- Yeas: 5
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0318 Filed
- Yeas: 9
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0318 c1
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor