+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- CS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Health Policy
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Appropriations
On October 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
937330 - Substitute Amendment (794588)
Delete lines 224 - 278 and insert:
794588 - Amendment
Delete lines 224 - 278 and insert:
211298 - Amendment to Amendment (794588)
Delete lines 5 - 6 and insert:
106366 - Amendment to Amendment (794588)
Delete lines 33 - 34 and insert:
699622 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0316 Filed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0316 c1
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor