+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Regulated Industries
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Introduced
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Regulated Industries
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/08/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries
On October 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
235266 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 791.01 - Definitions.
- 791.012 - Minimum fireworks safety standards.
- 791.013 - Testing and approval of sparklers; penalties.
- 791.015 - Registration of manufacturers, distributors, wholesalers, and retailers of sparklers.
- 791.02 - Sale of fireworks regulated; rules and regulations.
- 791.03 - Bond of licensees.
- 791.04 - Sale at wholesale, etc., exempted.
- 791.08 -
- 791.09 -
+ − Vote
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0314 Filed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor