+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2021-50
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 7025
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/21
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
August 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 306 Filed
- Yeas: 15
April 14, 2021: Floor vote: S 306 Filed
- Yeas: 118
March 18, 2021: Floor vote: S 306 Filed
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor