+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-25
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/19/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
764450 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/19/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
629500 - Amendment to Amendment (764450) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/19/2022)
Delete lines 93 - 94 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 383.145 - Newborn and infant hearing screening.
+ − Votes (4)
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 292 Filed
- Yeas: 10
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 292 Filed
- Yeas: 9
March 9, 2022: Floor vote: S 292 c1
- Yeas: 118
March 2, 2022: Floor vote: S 292 c1
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor