+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn prior to introduction
- Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/14/14, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On November 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Environmental Preservation and Conservation
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 337.401 - Use of right
- 556.102 - Definitions.
- 556.105 - Procedures.
- 556.106 - Liability of the member operator, excavator, and system.
- 556.107 - Violations.
- 556.108 - Exemptions.
- 556.114 - Low
- 556.116 - High
- 337.401 - Use of right-of-way for utilities subject to regulation; permit; fees.
- 556.114 - Low-impact marking practices.
- 556.116 - High-priority subsurface installations; special procedures.
+ − Vote
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0288 Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor