+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2021-123, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
- CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Immediately certified
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Introduced
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/01/21, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Rules
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
456088 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/2/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 633.102 - Definitions.
+ − Votes (5)
August 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 286 Filed
- Yeas: 9
August 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 286 c1
- Yeas: 12
August 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 286 c1
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 286 c1
- Yeas: 115
April 7, 2021: Floor vote: S 286 c1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor