+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2013-63
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/HB 369
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13
- Referred to Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/13, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
404658 - Amendment
03/20/2013 at 1:28 PM (Late Filed)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: House floor vote on S 0284 c1
- Yeas: 116
April 4, 2013: Senate floor vote on S 0284 c1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor