+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Criminal Justice
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
885578 - Amendment (Temporarily Postponed 1/11/2022)
Delete lines 17 - 19 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 817.354 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor