+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 103 (Ch. 2016-51)
- Substituted CS/HB 103
- Read 2nd time
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/24/16
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/03/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 11/18/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
On November 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 11/02/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 284 Filed
- Yeas: 4
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 284 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 284 Filed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor