+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 197 (Ch. 2015-137)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 197
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules
- Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
138500 - Amendment
Between lines 72 and 73 insert:
557242 - Amendment
Delete lines 70 - 74 and insert:
612458 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0282 Filed
- Yeas: 5
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0282 c1
- Yeas: 6
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0282 c1
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor