+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2017-1
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
- Ordered enrolled
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 3
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 527
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Immediately certified
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- In Messages
- Referred to Calendar
- Received
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/17
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/17, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Rules
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
534722 - Amendment
Between lines 48 and 49 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 775.082 - Penalties; applicability of sentencing structures; mandatory minimum sentences for certain reoffenders previously released from prison.
- 782.04 - Murder.
- 794.011 - Sexual battery.
- 893.135 - Trafficking; mandatory sentences; suspension or reduction of sentences; conspiracy to engage in trafficking.
- 921.141 - Sentence of death or life imprisonment for capital felonies; further proceedings to determine sentence.
- 921.142 - Sentence of death or life imprisonment for capital drug trafficking felonies; further proceedings to determine sentence.
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 280 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 280 Filed
- Yeas: 10
March 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 280
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
March 9, 2017: Floor vote: S 280
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor