+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Education
- Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendment
255644 - Amendment
Delete lines 34 - 53 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article IX - Section 4
- Article XII -
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 274 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 274 Filed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3