+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
- Introduced
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- Article VI - Section 7
+ − Vote
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 270 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor