+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-91
- Approved by Governor
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (477889)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment 477889 adopted
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
- Remaining references corrected to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (2)
612690 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/11/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
477889 - Amendment (Senate: Concurred 3/9/2022)
Remove lines 23-34 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 627.7491 -
+ − Votes (6)
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 266 Filed
- Yeas: 7
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 266 c1
- Yeas: 10
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 266 c1
- Yeas: 20
March 9, 2022: Floor vote: S 266 c1
- Yeas: 37
March 8, 2022: Floor vote: S 266 c1
- Yeas: 117
March 1, 2022: Floor vote: S 266 c1
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor