+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 357 (Ch. 2017-82)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 357
- Read 2nd time
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/29/17, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/22/17, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Regulated Industries
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
811978 - Amendment
Between lines 84 and 85 insert:
104484 - Amendment
Delete lines 68 - 108 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 264 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 264 c1
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 264 c1
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor