+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 233 (Ch. 2021-159)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 233
- Read 2nd time
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/21
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 8
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/18/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- CS by Education read 1st time
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/09/21, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/26/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On December 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
793606 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/26/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
107476 - Amendment to Amendment (793606) (Failed to Consider 1/26/2021)
Delete lines 10 - 84 and insert:
194994 - Amendment to Amendment (793606) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/26/2021)
Delete lines 28 - 79 and insert:
100826 - Amendment (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 2/10/2021)
Delete lines 105 - 107 and insert:
889170 - Substitute Amendment (100826) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/10/2021)
Delete lines 105 - 108 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 19, 2021: Floor vote: S 264 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
July 19, 2021: Floor vote: S 264 c1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
July 19, 2021: Floor vote: S 264 c1
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor