+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2022-137), HB 5001 (Ch. 2022-156), HB 5003 (Ch. 2022-157), CS/CS/SB 1000 (Ch. 2022-177), SB 1360 (Ch. 2022-66), SB 2524 (Ch. 2022-154)
- Substituted HB 5003
- Read 2nd time
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Filed
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
- Submitted for consideration by Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
210424 - Amendment (Favorable 2/10/2022)
Between lines 582 and 583 insert:
479108 - Amendment (Favorable 2/10/2022)
Between lines 873 and 874 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (26)
- 14.35 - Governor’s Medal of Freedom.
- 27.40 - Court-appointed counsel; circuit registries; minimum requirements; appointment by court.
- 27.5304 - Private court-appointed counsel; compensation; notice.
- 112.061 - Per diem and travel expenses of public officers, employees, and authorized persons; statewide travel management system.
- 215.18 - Transfers between funds; limitation.
- 215.32 - State funds; segregation.
- 215.559 - Hurricane Loss Mitigation Program.
- 216.262 - Authorized positions.
- 282.709 - State agency law enforcement radio system and interoperability network.
- 288.80125 - Triumph Gulf Coast Trust Fund.
- 321.04 - Personnel of the highway patrol; rank classifications; probationary status of new patrol officers; subsistence; special assignments.
- 331.3101 - Space Florida; travel and entertainment expenses.
- 337.11 - Contracting authority of department; bids; emergency repairs, supplemental agreements, and change orders; combined design and construction contracts; progress payments; records; requirements of vehicle registration.
- 339.08 - Use of moneys in State Transportation Trust Fund.
- 339.135 - Work program; legislative budget request; definitions; preparation, adoption, execution, and amendment.
- 375.041 - Land Acquisition Trust Fund.
- 376.3071 - Inland Protection Trust Fund; creation; purposes; funding.
- 381.986 - Medical use of marijuana.
- 381.988 - Medical marijuana testing laboratories; marijuana tests conducted by a certified laboratory.
- 576.045 - Nitrogen and phosphorus; findings and intent; fees; purpose; best management practices; waiver of liability; compliance; rules; exclusions; expiration.
- 1001.26 - Public broadcasting program system.
- 1004.6496 -
- 1011.62 - Funds for operation of schools.
- 1011.80 - Funds for operation of workforce education programs.
- 1011.81 - Florida College System Program Fund.
- 1013.62 - Charter schools capital outlay funding.
+ − Vote
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 2502 pb
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor