+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 6549 (Ch. 2017-230)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
- Now in Judiciary
- Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
732422 - Substitute Amendment (816866)
Delete lines 67 - 68 and insert:
816866 - Amendment
Delete lines 67 - 68 and insert:
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 24 Filed
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor