+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable by Commerce and Tourism, laid on Table; YEAS 3 NAYS 3
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/17/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/13/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations; Rules
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 212.20 - Funds collected, disposition; additional powers of department; operational expense; refund of taxes adjudicated unconstitutionally collected.
- 218.64 - Local government half-cent sales tax; uses; limitations.
- 288.0001 - Economic Development Programs Evaluation.
- 288.11625 - Sports development.
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 236 Filed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor