+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1105 (Ch. 2020-138)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On October 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/15/19, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
518450 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 10/15/2019)
Delete lines 115 - 137
+ − Statute Amended
- 39.01304 -
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 236 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor