+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Fiscal Policy
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
357004 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 395.6025 - Rural hospital replacement facilities.
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 236 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 236 Filed
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor