+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
566960 - Amendment (Favorable 11/13/2019)
Between lines 17 and 18 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 232 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor