+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2013-165
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/HB 323
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13
- Referred to Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/21/13, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/14/13, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 256.015 - Display of state flag; protocol.
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: House floor vote on S 0230
- Yeas: 118
April 4, 2013: Senate floor vote on S 0230
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor