+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 105 (Ch. 2022-213)
- Substituted CS/HB 105
- Read 2nd time
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Retained on Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Environment and Natural Resources
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/03/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
On September 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
763050 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/7/2022)
Delete lines 27 - 42 and insert:
727890 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/15/2022)
Delete lines 23 - 41 and insert:
713858 - Amendment to Amendment (727890) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/15/2022)
Delete lines 20 - 25 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 224 Filed
- Yeas: 8
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 224 Filed
- Yeas: 6
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 224 c1
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3