+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Environment and Natural Resources
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On September 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor