+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Now in Rules
- Introduced
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
487700 - Amendment
Delete line 68 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 204 Filed
- Yeas: 5
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 204 c1
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor