+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Community Affairs
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
285024 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
905544 - Amendment to Amendment (285024)
Between lines 681 and 682 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor