+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2021-228), CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/10/21, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Education read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/03/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On December 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
794706 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/3/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
680478 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/12/2021)
Delete lines 20 - 37 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1008.25 - Public school student progression; student support; reporting requirements.
+ − Votes (3)
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 200 Filed
- Yeas: 9
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 200 c1
- Yeas: 8
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 200 c1
- Yeas: 19