+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
On September 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 11.045 - Lobbying before the Legislature; registration and reporting; exemptions; penalties.
+ − Vote
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0192 Filed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor