+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
- In returning messages
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Insisted on amendment , and requested the Senate to concur
- Insisted on amendment (822543)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Requested House to recede
- Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (822543)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 76 NAYS 34
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (822543)
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
- Referred to Calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/14/19
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/07/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (10)
816742 - Amendment
Between lines 221 and 222 insert:
533534 - S Amend. to H Amend. (822543)
Delete lines 5 - 529.
313496 - S Amend. to H Amend. (822543)
Between lines 142 and 143 insert:
822543 - Amendment
Between lines 1461 and 1462, insert:
237660 - Amendment
Between lines 261 and 262 insert:
671644 - Amendment
Between lines 363 and 364 insert:
593730 - Amendment
Delete lines 666 - 683.
633662 - Amendment
Delete lines 176 - 222 and insert:
950762 - Amendment
Delete lines 268 - 295.
823188 - Amendment
Delete lines 370 - 397.
+ − Statutes Amended (39)
- 381.4018 - Physician workforce assessment and development.
- 456.013 - Department; general licensing provisions.
- 458.3312 - Specialties.
- 458.347 - Physician assistants.
- 459.0055 - General licensure requirements.
- 459.022 - Physician assistants.
- 460.408 - Continuing chiropractic education.
- 460.4166 - Registered chiropractic assistants.
- 464.202 - Duties and powers of the board.
- 464.203 - Certified nursing assistants; certification requirement.
- 464.204 - Denial, suspension, or revocation of certification; disciplinary actions.
- 466.006 - Examination of dentists.
- 466.007 - Examination of dental hygienists.
- 466.017 - Prescription of drugs; anesthesia.
- 466.031 - "Dental laboratory" defined.
- 466.036 - Information; periodic inspections; equipment and supplies.
- 468.701 - Definitions.
- 468.707 - Licensure requirements.
- 468.711 - Renewal of license; continuing education.
- 468.713 - Responsibilities of athletic trainers.
- 468.723 - Exemptions.
- 468.803 - License, registration, and examination requirements.
- 480.033 - Definitions.
- 480.041 - Massage therapists; qualifications; licensure; endorsement.
- 480.042 - Examinations.
- 480.046 - Grounds for disciplinary action by the board.
- 490.003 - Definitions.
- 490.005 - Licensure by examination.
- 490.006 - Licensure by endorsement.
- 491.0045 - Intern registration; requirements.
- 491.0046 - Provisional license; requirements.
- 491.005 - Licensure by examination.
- 491.006 - Licensure or certification by endorsement.
- 491.007 - Renewal of license, registration, or certificate.
- 491.009 - Discipline.
- 945.42 - Definitions; ss. 945.40-945.49.
- 464.019 - Approval of nursing education programs.
- 466.00673 - Repeal of a health access dental license.
- 466.031 - “Dental laboratory” defined.
+ − Votes (5)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 188 Filed
- Yeas: 10
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 188 c1
- Yeas: 9
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 188 c1
- Yeas: 21
May 1, 2019: Floor vote: S 188 c2
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 34
March 21, 2019: Floor vote: S 188 c2
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor