+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Banking and Insurance
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
929734 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/30/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 828.32 -
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 186 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor