+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2013-101, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 648 (Ch. 2013-174)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 78 NAYS 36
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/HB 7155
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (343188)
- Amendment(s) failed (527092)
- Ordered engrossed
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 6
- Immediately certified
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- In Messages
- Referred to Calendar
- Received
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- SPB 7138 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1842) by Banking and Insurance
+ − Amendments (13)
527092 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 8:52 AM
643486 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 8:22 AM
779250 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 8:21 AM
240302 - Amendment
04/23/2013 at 8:07 PM
343188 - Amendment
04/23/2013 at 2:52 PM
165038 - Amendment
Delete lines 458 - 460 and insert:
795776 - Amendment
Delete lines 111 - 143 and insert:
583866 - Amendment
Delete lines 458 - 460 and insert:
431718 - Amendment
Delete lines 111 - 143 and insert:
876568 - Amendment
Delete line 472 and insert:
310484 - Amendment
Delete lines 144 - 305 and insert:
404430 - Amendment
Between lines 861 and 862 insert:
786768 - Amendment
Between lines 861 and 862 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (51)
- 624.25 - Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
- 624.26 - Collaborative arrangement with the Department of Health and Human Services.
- 624.34 - Authority of Department of Law Enforcement to accept fingerprints of, and exchange criminal history records with respect to, certain persons.
- 626.995 - Scope of part.
- 626.9951 - Definitions.
- 626.9952 - Registration required; purpose.
- 626.9953 - Qualifications for registration; application required.
- 626.9954 - Disqualification from registration.
- 626.9955 - Registered navigator list.
- 626.9956 - Notice of change of registrant information.
- 626.9957 - Conduct prohibited; denial, revocation, or suspension of registration.
- 626.9958 - Rulemaking.
- 627.402 - Definitions.
- 627.410 - Filing, approval of forms.
- 627.411 - Grounds for disapproval.
- 627.6425 - Renewability of individual coverage.
- 627.648 - Florida Comprehensive Health Association Act.
- 627.6482 - Definitions.
- 627.6484 - Dissolution of association; termination of enrollment; availability of other coverage.
- 627.6486 - Eligibility.
- 627.64872 -
- 627.6488 - Florida Comprehensive Health Association.
- 627.6489 - Disease Management Program.
- 627.649 - Administrator.
- 627.6492 - Participation of insurers.
- 627.6494 - Assessments; deferment, limitation.
- 627.6496 - Issuing of policies.
- 627.6498 - Minimum benefits coverage; exclusions; premiums; deductibles.
- 627.6499 - Reporting by insurers and third
- 627.6571 - Guaranteed renewability of coverage.
- 627.6675 - Conversion on termination of eligibility.
- 627.6699 - Employee Health Care Access Act.
- 641.31 - Health maintenance contracts.
- 641.3922 - Conversion contracts; conditions.
- 624.25 -
- 624.26 -
- 626.995 -
- 626.9951 -
- 626.9952 -
- 626.9953 -
- 626.9954 -
- 626.9955 -
- 626.9956 -
- 626.9957 -
- 626.9958 -
- 627.402 - Definitions; specified certificates not included.
- 627.6484 - Termination of enrollment; availability of other coverage.
- 627.64872 - Florida Health Insurance Plan.
- 627.6499 - Reporting by insurers and third-party administrators.
- 626.022 - Scope of part.
- 626.207 - Disqualification of applicants and licensees; penalties against licensees; rulemaking authority.
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 36
April 24, 2013: Floor Vote: Senate
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor