+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2015-40
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 109
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
- Received
- Referred to Calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/10/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Fiscal Policy
On December 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0184 Filed
- Yeas: 10
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0184 Filed
- Yeas: 5
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0184 Filed
- Yeas: 8
April 22, 2015: Floor vote: S 0184
- Yeas: 118
April 2, 2015: Floor vote: S 0184
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor