+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
- Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
888136 - Amendment (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 2/16/2022)
Delete line 80 and insert:
547636 - Substitute Amendment (888136) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2022)
Delete lines 79 - 82.
+ − Statute Amended
- 595.420 - Food recovery; legislative intent; department functions.
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1832 Filed
- Yeas: 8
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1832 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor