+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/21, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
755356 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/6/2021)
Delete lines 26 - 49 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 252.905 - Emergency planning information; public records exemption.
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 1824 Filed
- Yeas: 7
June 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 1824 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor