+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7033 (Ch. 2021-155)
- Substituted HB 7033
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/30/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (3)
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1816 Filed
- Yeas: 10
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1816 Filed
- Yeas: 8
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1816 Filed
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor