+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2019-6
- Approved by Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 423
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
- Referred to Calendar
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/19
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
- Now in Rules
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 3 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 180 Filed
- Yeas: 3
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 180 Filed
- Yeas: 16
March 27, 2019: Floor vote: S 180 Filed
- Yeas: 114
March 7, 2019: Floor vote: S 180 Filed
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor