+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
- Now in Community Affairs
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendment
413412 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/5/2020)
Delete lines 31 - 153 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1766 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1766 c1
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor