+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/22/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 212.08 - Sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage tax; specified exemptions.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 176 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 176 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 176 Filed
- Yeas: 18