+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
539134 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/25/2022)
Delete line 45 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 499.075 -
+ − Vote
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1718 Filed
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor