+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Appropriations
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment 1
Between lines 50 and 51 insert:
218922 - Amendment to Amendment (681624)
04/09/2013 at 11:06 AM
646032 - Amendment to Amendment (681624)
04/08/2013 at 3:56 PM
681624 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 57.111 - Civil actions and administrative proceedings initiated by state agencies; attorneys’ fees and costs.
- 119.12 - Attorney’s fees.
- 120.52 - Definitions.
- 120.55 - Publication.
- 120.56 - Challenges to rules.
- 120.569 - Decisions which affect substantial interests.
- 120.57 - Additional procedures for particular cases.
- 120.573 - Mediation of disputes.
- 120.595 - Attorney’s fees.
- 120.68 - Judicial review.
- 120.695 - Notice of noncompliance.
- 420.9072 - State Housing Initiatives Partnership Program.
- 420.9075 - Local housing assistance plans; partnerships.
- 443.091 - Benefit eligibility conditions.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor