+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2017-151)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
635208 - Amendment
Delete lines 323 - 369.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1680 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor