+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On September 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 741.212 - Marriages between persons of the same sex.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor