+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7012 (Ch. 2020-39)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary
- Remaining references corrected to Judiciary; Appropriations
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
672124 - Amendment (Withdrawn 2/11/2020)
Delete line 113 and insert:
967794 - Amendment (Delete All) (Withdrawn 2/11/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
633722 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/13/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (52)
- 394.455 - Definitions.
- 394.459 - Rights of patients.
- 394.4598 - Guardian advocate.
- 394.4599 - Notice.
- 394.461 - Designation of receiving and treatment facilities and receiving systems.
- 394.4615 - Clinical records; confidentiality.
- 394.462 - Transportation.
- 394.4625 - Voluntary admissions.
- 394.463 - Involuntary examination.
- 394.4655 - Involuntary outpatient services.
- 394.467 - Involuntary inpatient placement.
- 394.495 - Child and adolescent mental health system of care; programs and services.
- 394.496 - Service planning.
- 394.499 - Integrated children’s crisis stabilization unit/juvenile addictions receiving facility services.
- 394.656 - Criminal Justice, Mental Health, and Substance Abuse Reinvestment Grant Program.
- 394.657 - County planning councils or committees.
- 394.658 - Criminal Justice, Mental Health, and Substance Abuse Reinvestment Grant Program requirements.
- 394.674 - Eligibility for publicly funded substance abuse and mental health services; fee collection requirements.
- 394.908 - Substance abuse and mental health funding equity; distribution of appropriations.
- 394.9085 - Behavioral provider liability.
- 397.305 - Legislative findings, intent, and purpose.
- 397.311 - Definitions.
- 397.321 - Duties of the department.
- 397.416 - Substance abuse treatment services; qualified professional.
- 397.501 - Rights of individuals.
- 397.675 - Criteria for involuntary admissions, including protective custody, emergency admission, and other involuntary assessment, involuntary treatment, and alternative involuntary assessment for minors, for purposes of assessment and stabilization, and for
- 397.6751 - Service provider responsibilities regarding involuntary admissions.
- 397.681 - Involuntary petitions; general provisions; court jurisdiction and right to counsel.
- 397.6811 - Involuntary assessment and stabilization.
- 397.6814 - Involuntary assessment and stabilization; contents of petition.
- 397.6815 - Involuntary assessment and stabilization; procedure.
- 397.6818 - Court determination.
- 397.6819 - Involuntary assessment and stabilization; responsibility of licensed service provider.
- 397.6821 - Extension of time for completion of involuntary assessment and stabilization.
- 397.6822 - Disposition of individual after involuntary assessment.
- 397.693 - Involuntary treatment.
- 397.695 - Involuntary services; persons who may petition.
- 397.6951 - Contents of petition for involuntary services.
- 397.6955 - Duties of court upon filing of petition for involuntary services.
- 397.6957 - Hearing on petition for involuntary services.
- 397.697 - Court determination; effect of court order for involuntary services.
- 397.6971 - Early release from involuntary services.
- 397.6975 - Extension of involuntary services period.
- 397.6977 - Disposition of individual upon completion of involuntary services.
- 397.6978 - Guardian advocate; patient incompetent to consent; substance abuse disorder.
- 397.99 - School substance abuse prevention partnership grants.
- 409.972 - Mandatory and voluntary enrollment.
- 464.012 - Licensure of advanced practice registered nurses; fees; controlled substance prescribing.
- 744.2007 - Powers and duties.
- 790.065 - Sale and delivery of firearms.
- 916.111 - Training of mental health experts.
- 916.115 - Appointment of experts.
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1678 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor